WY HB0193 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to courts; increasing and conforming specified court automation and filing fees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Court automation fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-11-2-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Amendment failed 3-27-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Amendment failed 3-27-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 66 | |
2020-03-12 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0040 | |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0040 |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0040 |
2020-03-06 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0040 | |
2020-03-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 17-11-2-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-03-03 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-02 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 |
2020-02-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-14 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 51-9-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |