WY HB0193 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to animals; amending the crimes of cruelty to animals and aggravated cruelty to animals; amending penalties; providing for forfeiture of animals as specified; authorizing conditions a court may require as part of an order of protection in a domestic abuse case related to animal protection; repealing a provision; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-02 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-03HouseDid Not Consider in COW
2017-02-02HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-02HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2017-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback