WY HB0186 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing a sales and use tax exemption for equipment purchased to dispense natural gas into motor vehicles as specified; providing for a contingent repeal of the sales and use tax; requiring reports; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax exemption for natural gas filling stations equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-01-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26SenateCommittee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2013-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03
2013-01-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-23HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-23 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-23HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-01-22HousePassed CoW
2013-01-21HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-21HouseRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03
2013-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback