WY HB0185 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to corporate shares and distributions; authorizing corporations to issue certificate tokens in lieu of stock certificates as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate stock-certificate tokens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 93
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0049
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0049
2019-02-20HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0049
2019-02-19 Assigned Number HEA No. 0049
2019-02-19HouseConcur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2019-02-15HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-15Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-14Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-13SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-12SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-02-04SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-01House3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
2019-01-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-30HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-28HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-28HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback