WY HB0180 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 191 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to child protection; limiting disclosure of information obtained in a child abuse or neglect case as specified; requiring a court order to obtain information as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child interviews-neglect and abuse cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - Senate - Adopted HB0180JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Adopted HB0180JC001: 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Adopted HB0180JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Adopted HB0180JC001: 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Concur:Failed 1-57-2-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - Concur:Failed 1-57-2-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 191 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed HEA No. 0105
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0105
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0105
2015-03-05 Assigned Number HEA No. 0105
2015-03-05SenateAdopted HB0180JC001: 28-1-1-0-0
2015-03-05HouseAdopted HB0180JC001: 59-0-1-0-0
2015-02-27SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-26HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-26HouseConcur:Failed 1-57-2-0-0
2015-02-25HouseReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
2015-02-24Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-23SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-23SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-23 Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2015-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-05House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2015-02-04House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-03HouseCOW:Passed
2015-01-30HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-30 Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-01-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2015-01-26HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback