WY HB0178 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school finance; limiting transportation for nonresident students as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation of nonresident students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number 79
2020-03-12 Governor Signed HEA No. 0041
2020-03-09SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0041
2020-03-06HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0041
2020-03-06 Assigned Number HEA No. 0041
2020-03-06HouseConcur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2020-03-05HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-05Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
2020-03-04Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-03SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-02SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-28SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2020-02-27SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2020-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-24HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0
2020-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback