WY HB0173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public nuisances; defining animals to include yaks for county animal control purposes; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public nuisance-yaks.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Rep. Kathy Davison [R] | Rep. John Eklund [R] |
Rep. Keith Gingery [R] | Rep. Mark Semlek [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H05; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0173.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0173.pdf |