WY HB0171 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Professional Architectural, Engineering and Land Surveying Services Procurement Act; specifying residency requirements for selection to provide professional services; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Architect instate residency definition.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Loucks [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Rep. Allen Jaggi [R] | Rep. Norine Kasperik [R] |
Rep. Kendell Kroeker [R] | Rep. Tom Reeder [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] |
Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0- (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0- (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-7-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0171.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0171.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0171.pdf |