WY HB0170 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - President Signed HEA No. 0089
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to sales tax; providing for the purchase of advertising and direct mail as specified in accordance with the streamlined sales tax agreement; providing definitions; repealing obsolete provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Streamlined sales tax-direct mail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-25SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0089
2013-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0089
2013-02-22 Assigned Number HEA0089
2013-02-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-20SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-05SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-05SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03
2013-01-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-23HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-21HousePassed CoW
2013-01-18HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-18HouseRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-16HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03
2013-01-15HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback