WY HB0169 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; modifying duties of school district boards of trustees to require access to a minimum of twelve (12) post secondary credit hours for high school students as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
K-12 post secondary education options.
Sponsors
Rep. Ocean Andrew [R] | Rep. Ryan Berger [R] | Rep. Kenneth Clouston [R] | Rep. Steve Harshman [R] |
Rep. Martha Lawley [R] | Rep. Karlee Provenza [D] | Sen. Affie Ellis [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-1-1-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Did not Consider for Introduction |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-1-1-0-0 |
2023-01-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-24 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2023-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |