WY HB0167 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to judicial retirement; modifying mandatory retirement age for supreme court and district court judges; imposing a mandatory retirement age upon circuit court judges; making the act contingent upon passage of a constitutional amendment as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Judicial retirement age.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Samuel Krone [R] | Rep. Tim Stubson [R] |
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-21 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2013-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0167.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0167.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0167.htm |