WY HB0166 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing for a sales tax exemption for lodging services provided by a licensed guide or outfitter; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Lodging sales tax-exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-07 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2023/HB0166 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2023/Introduced/HB0166.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2023/Fiscal/HB0166.pdf |