WY HB0166 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; increasing the annual decal fee for a plug-in electric vehicle; specifying form of electric vehicle decals; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Electric vehicle fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Mark Kinner [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Concur:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-25-3-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-25-3-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 121 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0063 | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0063 |
2019-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0063 |
2019-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0063 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Concur:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-12 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 32-25-3-0-0 |
2019-01-31 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-25 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-23 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2019-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |