WY HB0166 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - COW:Failed 8-51-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - COW:Failed 8-51-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; increasing the tax on alcoholic and malt beverages; revising distribution of those taxes; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Alcohol taxation-school funding.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Rep. Joann Dayton-Selman [D] | Sen. Dan Furphy [R] | Rep. Michael Madden [R] |
Sen. Liisa Anselmi-Dalton [D] | Sen. Ray Peterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - COW:Failed 8-51-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - House - COW:Failed 8-51-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - COW:Failed 8-51-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | COW:Failed 8-51-1-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-01 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2017-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |