WY HB0166 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 158 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to electrical safety and fire prevention; updating references; removing requirements relating to elevators in buildings as specified; clarifying duties of the state fire marshal and cities and revising experience requirements for limited technician and low voltage technician licenses; extending local inspection bodies authority over appeals as specified; providing for rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electrical safety and fire prevention- amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 158 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed HEA No. 0098
2015-03-04SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0098
2015-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0098
2015-03-03 Assigned Number HEA No. 0098
2015-03-03HouseConcur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2015-03-02HouseReceived for Concurrence
2015-03-02Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0
2015-02-27Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-26SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-26 Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2015-02-03SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-02House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2015-01-30House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-29HouseCOW:Passed
2015-01-27HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-27 Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-01-26HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2015-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-21 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback