WY HB0163 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to employment of children; clarifying the penalties for violating child labor laws; clarifying an exemption; repealing a provision; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Child labor penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Rep. Timothy Hallinan [R] |
Rep. Patrick Sweeney [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Assigned Chapter Number 137 | |
2019-02-27 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0080 | |
2019-02-25 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0080 |
2019-02-25 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0080 |
2019-02-22 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0080 | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-13 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 |
2019-01-31 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-22 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |