WY HB0162 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 114 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 114 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming state penitentiary; directing funds to the Wyoming state penitentiary capital construction account within the strategic investments and projects account as specified; providing for the investment of the account and directing investment earnings as specified; providing legislative findings; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Penitentiary savings fund-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-5-2-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-5-2-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Chapter No. 114 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0054 | |
2018-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number 114 | |
2018-03-10 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0054 |
2018-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0054 |
2018-03-09 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0054 | |
2018-03-09 | House | Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-08 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-05 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-5-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-16 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 45-14-1-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-13 | Bill Number Assigned |