WY HB0156 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to inspection of brands; providing an exception for brand and ownership inspection and movement of livestock in emergency situations; providing for declaration and recognition of emergency situations as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Movement of livestock in emergency situations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted HB0156JC01 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - H Adopted HB0156JC01 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - H Adopted HB0156JC01 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0105 |
2013-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0105 |
2013-02-26 | Assigned Number HEA0105 | |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Adopted HB0156JC01 |
2013-02-25 | House | Adopted HB0156JC01 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-19 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2013-02-19 | House | Did Not Concur |
2013-02-14 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-12 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-29 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-29 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-24 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2013-01-14 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |