WY HB0152 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Chapter No. 107 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Chapter No. 107 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to impact assistance payments; revising duties of the department of environmental quality and industrial siting division as specified; revising how impact assistance payment amounts are calculated; providing rulemaking authority; repealing conflicting provisions; providing applicability; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Industrial siting impact payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Chapter No. 107 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-04 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0071 | |
2015-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0071 |
2015-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0071 |
2015-02-27 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0071 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-24 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-20 | Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-03 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-03 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-30 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-30 | Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2015-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |