WY HB0146 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:Failed 24-36-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:Failed 24-36-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property taxation; specifying that the valuation of tangible personal property shall consider depreciation and shall not be increased above the market value of the property; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Personal property depreciation.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bear [R] | Rep. Marshall Burt [L] | Rep. Bill Fortner [R] | Rep. Jeremy Haroldson [R] |
Rep. Mark Jennings [R] | Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. Pepper Ottman [R] | Sen. Tom James [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - COW:Failed 24-36-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | COW:Failed 24-36-0-0-0 |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-18 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2021-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-24 | Bill Number Assigned |