WY HB0141 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - President Signed HEA No. 0034
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - President Signed HEA No. 0034
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to weapons; repealing the restriction on persons authorized to carry a concealed weapon from carrying a concealed weapon into any place where persons are assembled for public worship; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Concealed weapons in places of worship.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Loucks [R] | Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] | Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] |
Sen. Curt Meier [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0034 |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0034 |
2018-03-07 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0034 | |
2018-03-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 53-6-1-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |