WY HB0137 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to real property; prohibiting the creation of private transfer fee obligations; requiring disclosure and recording of existing private transfer fee obligations; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Private transfer fee obligations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW | |
2011-02-17 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Johnson, Martin and Scott Nayes: Senator(s) Case and Hines Ayes 3 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-17 | (S07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S07 | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-27 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Brechtel, Campbell, Gay, Gingery and Peasley. Excused: Representative(s) Goggles Ayes 54 Nays 5 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-26 | Amendment Failed | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-24 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Byrd, Illoway, Jaggi, Kroeker, Patton, Roscoe, Shepperson and Stubson Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-24 | (H07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-14 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H07 | |
2011-01-14 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0137.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0137.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Engross/HB0137.pdf |