WY HB0134 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to sales tax; imposing a statewide assessment on sales of lodging services; providing for distribution of the assessment collected; providing an exemption; revising the local optional lodging tax; amending authorized expenditures; repealing conflicting provisions; creating the Wyoming tourism account; creating the Wyoming tourism reserve and projects account; providing for implementation of the new assessment; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming tourism account funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - Concur:Passed 47-13-0-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-0-0-1 (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Amendment failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Amendment failed 6-23-0-0-1 (Y: 6 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Amendment failed 8-21-0-0-1 (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Amendment failed 11-18-0-0-1 (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - Amendment failed 16-42-2-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 45-14-1-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06 Assigned Chapter Number 14
2020-03-06 Governor Signed HEA No. 0007
2020-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0007
2020-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0007
2020-03-02 Assigned Number HEA No. 0007
2020-03-02HouseConcur:Passed 47-13-0-0-0
2020-02-28HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-02-28Senate3rd Reading:Passed 16-13-0-0-1
2020-02-27Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-26SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-26SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-17House3rd Reading:Passed 39-19-2-0-0
2020-02-14House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-13HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-12HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-12HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 45-14-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Introduced/HB0134.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Engross/HB0134.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Enroll/HB0134.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Fiscal/HB0134.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134#5044
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134#-69
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134#5264
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134#5265
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134#-469
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134#432
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134#433
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134#455
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134#456
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134#457
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0134#5408

Bill Comments

feedback