WY HB0132 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-15-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Hathaway scholarship program; increasing scholarship awards as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hathaway scholarships-award increase.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-15-1-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-13-2-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19Senate3rd Reading:Failed 14-15-1-0-0
2019-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-14SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-12SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-02-11Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-01-30SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-30House3rd Reading:Passed 45-13-2-0-0
2019-01-29House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-28HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-18HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-18HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-17House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-17HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback