WY HB0121 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; specifying limitations on delegates to an Article V convention; providing definitions; clarifying state convention refers to a state ratifying convention; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Article V convention limitations.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Rep. David Miller [R] | Rep. Nathan Winters [R] |
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Ray Peterson [R] |
Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0121JC001: 1-58-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0121JC001: 1-58-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Failed 19-39-2-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Failed 19-39-2-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0121JC001: 1-58-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Failed 19-39-2-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Concur:Failed 19-39-2-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Appointed JCC02 Members |
2015-03-05 | House | Appointed JCC02 Members |
2015-03-05 | House | Did Not Adopt HB0121JC001: 1-58-1-0-0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-27 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-27 | House | Concur:Failed 19-39-2-0-0 |
2015-02-27 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-25 | Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 |
2015-02-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-03 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-30 | Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |