WY HB0121 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to civil and criminal procedure; specifying circumstances under which evidence of a prior sexual assault offense may be admitted in criminal and civil cases involving sexual assault; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Admissibility of evidence in sex offense cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H01 (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H01 (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | House | Did Not Consider in COW |
2014-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-20 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2014-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0121.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/HB0121.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0121.htm |