WY HB0121 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Christensen, Cooper, Dockstader, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Martin, Perkins, Peterson, Ross and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Coe, Driskill, Emerich, Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Landen, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Scott. Excused: Senator(s) Johnson Ayes 10 Nays 19 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Christensen, Cooper, Dockstader, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Martin, Perkins, Peterson, Ross and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Coe, Driskill, Emerich, Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Landen, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Scott. Excused: Senator(s) Johnson Ayes 10 Nays 19 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public records; setting reasonable time for production of public records; clarifying reasonable fees for duplication of public records; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public records.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Dave Bonner [R] | Rep. Edward Buchanan [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] |
Rep. Amy Edmonds [R] | Sen. Marty Martin [D] | Rep. John Patton [R] | Rep. Matt Teeters [R] |
Rep. Sue Wallis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Christensen, Cooper, Dockstader, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Martin, Perkins, Peterson, Ross and Von Flatern. Nays: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Coe, Driskill, Emerich, Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Landen, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Rothfuss, Schiffer and Scott. Excused: Senator(s) Johnson Ayes 10 Nays 19 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-17 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Christensen, Dockstader and Esquibel, F. Nayes: Senator(s) Burns and Driskill Ayes 3 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-17 | (S06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Rereferred to S06 | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S01 | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-31 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Goggles, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Brechtel, Byrd, Davison, Greear, McKim and Stubson. Ayes 54 Nays 6 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-31 | Amendment Failed | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-27 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-25 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Brown, Greene, Peasley and Throne Nayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Cannady, Krone and Nicholas B Ayes 5 Nays 4 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-25 | (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2011-01-13 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0121.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0121.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Engross/HB0121.pdf |