WY HB0120 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor Vetoed HEA No. 0105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to ad valorem taxation; providing an exemption for the storage of energy production equipment prior to installation in this state; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy production inventory exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor Vetoed HEA No. 0105
2019-03-18 Veto Message Received
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0105
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0105
2019-02-25 Assigned Number HEA No. 0105
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-19SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2019-01-30SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29House3rd Reading:Passed 41-18-1-0-0
2019-01-28House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-25HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-23HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-23HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-01-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback