WY HB0114 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - 3rd Reading:Failed 3-25-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to concealed weapons; creating a Wyoming Repeal Gun Free Zones Act; creating exceptions for the carrying of concealed weapons by permit holders as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming Repeal Gun Free Zones Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 3-25-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 3-25-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-30 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-30 - House - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-04Senate3rd Reading:Failed 3-25-2-0-0
2015-03-03Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-03-02SenateCOW Passed
2015-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-26 Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2015-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2015-02-02SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-02-02House3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0
2015-01-30House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-29HouseCOW Passed
2015-01-28HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-28 Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2015-01-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2015-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback