WY HB0113 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health; imposing requirements for the issuance of public health orders; limiting the duration and scope of public health orders as specified; modifying quarantine and other provisions relating to public health orders; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public health orders-limitations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-22 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2021-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-05 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0113 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/HB0113.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/HB0113.pdf |