WY HB0113 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 115 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 115 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Medical Assistance and Services Act; requiring the department of health to seek permission for dependent waiver services for the dependents of military service members as specified; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medicaid waiver program-military personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Adopted HB0113JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Adopted HB0113JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Adopted HB0113JC001: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Adopted HB0113JC001: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - House - Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Adopted HB0113JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Adopted HB0113JC001: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Adopted HB0113JC001: 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - House - Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 115 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0060 | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0060 |
2017-02-24 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0060 |
2017-02-23 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0060 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Adopted HB0113JC001: 30-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-22 | House | Adopted HB0113JC001: 60-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-02-15 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-02-15 | House | Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 |
2017-02-14 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2017-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-08 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-24 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2017-01-19 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-19 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2017-01-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |