WY HB0113 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Governmental Claims Act; providing a waiver of governmental immunity for damages caused by a violation of whistleblower statutes for health care facilities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Governmental immunity-waiver for health care facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Rep. Sue Wilson [R] |
Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-12 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 53-7-0-0-0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/HB0113.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Introduced/HB0113.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/HB0113.pdf |