WY HB0113 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public works and contracts; prohibiting governmental units from requiring contractors to have agreements with organized labor on public works projects; prohibiting discrimination against contractors for having or not having agreements with organized labor; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Government contracts-labor organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Reeder [R] | Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Kendell Kroeker [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] |
Rep. David Miller [R] | Rep. Tim Stubson [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - H04 Motion to Do Not Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with HR 5-4 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 45 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 45 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Died in Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with HR 5-4 |
2014-02-21 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2014-02-18 | House | Rereferred to H04 |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 |
2014-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0113.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/HB0113.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0113.htm |