WY HB0113 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health; extending the critical access/rural hospital endowment challenge program; amending qualifications for receipt of funds; providing for segregation and specified use of a portion of existing funds; modifying reversion dates; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Critical access endowment challenge program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-07 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2012-03-15 Governor Signed HEA0039
2012-03-07 (S) President Signed HEA No. 0039
2012-03-07 (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0039
2012-03-07 Assigned Number HEA0039
2012-03-07 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-03-06 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-03-05 (S) Passed CoW
2012-03-02 (S) Placed on General File
2012-03-02 (S10) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-28 (S) Introduced and Referred to S10
2012-02-28 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-28 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-27 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-24 (H) Passed CoW
2012-02-21 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-21 (H10) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-17 (H) Introduced and Referred to H10
2012-02-15 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback