WY HB0112 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to retirement benefits administered by the Wyoming retirement system; providing for two single, additional, noncumulative benefit payments under the Wyoming Retirement Act, the Wyoming State Highway Patrol, Game and Fish Warden and Criminal Investigator Retirement Act and the Firemen's Pension Account Reform Act of 1981; providing an appropriation; specifying legislative intent and making legislative findings; requiring a study, reports and certifications as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming retirement plans-adjustments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-24-3-0-1 (Y: 32 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 43-15-2-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateDid Not Consider for Introduction
2020-02-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 32-24-3-0-1
2020-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-24HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 43-15-2-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-06 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback