WY HB0112 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to labor and employment; authorizing employers to set policies regarding tip and gratuity pooling and distribution as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tip distribution policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-13 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 6 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27HouseIndefinitely Postponed
2013-02-19SenateAppointed JCC02 Members
2013-02-19HouseAppointed JCC02 Members
2013-02-13SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-13HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-13HouseDid Not Concur
2013-02-13HouseReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-13SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-13 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-13 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-12 Amendment Failed
2013-02-12 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-12SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-02-11SenatePassed CoW
2013-01-29SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-29SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-29SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03
2013-01-18SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-15 Amendment Failed
2013-01-15 Amendment Failed
2013-01-15 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-14HousePassed CoW
2013-01-14 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-14HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-01-14HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-14HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03
2013-01-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback