WY HB0100 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - President Signed HEA No. 0013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - President Signed HEA No. 0013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; adjusting membership of the state emergency response commission; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State emergency response commission membership.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Salazar [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0013 |
2018-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0013 |
2018-03-06 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0013 | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-16 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-05 | Bill Number Assigned |