WY HB0097 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to sales and use tax; providing an exemption from sales and use taxes for broadband internet service infrastructure as specified; requiring reports; specifying a sunset date; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation of broadband internet infrastructure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - Concur:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-12-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-8-2-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 120
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0059
2019-02-21SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0059
2019-02-21HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0059
2019-02-20 Assigned Number HEA No. 0059
2019-02-20HouseConcur:Passed 55-4-1-0-0
2019-02-19HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-19Senate3rd Reading:Passed 17-12-1-0-0
2019-02-15Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-14SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-08SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-08SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2019-02-04SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-01House3rd Reading:Passed 50-8-2-0-0
2019-01-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-30HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-24HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback