WY HB0094 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; requiring that any person appointed to serve on the state board of parole has been a resident of the state of Wyoming for at least two (2) years prior to their appointment and remains a resident during the member's term; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Board of parole-Wyoming residency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-2-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-2-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-02-17 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-2-1-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-19 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-18 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2023-01-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-09 | Bill Number Assigned |