WY HB0093 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to day care facilities; expanding exemption from certification; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Day care facilities-certification exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H04 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H04 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Rereferred to S10; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04 | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-23 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-22 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-20 | (H04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |