WY HB0091 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing for a severance tax credit for certain mineral exploration as specified; providing procedures; providing for a report; providing for rules and regulations; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Economic diversification incentives for mineral exploration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-2-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-2-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | COW:S Did not consider for COW |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-05 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-2-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-18 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 58-1-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-03 | Bill Number Assigned |