WY HB0091 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education accountability; extending timelines specified for phase I of the accountability system under the Wyoming Accountability in Education Act; clarifying specified assessment and accountability provisions; modifying accountability system college readiness measures as specified; modifying duties and tasks of phase I development and initial implementation; modifying school district assessment requirements for determining graduation eligibility; authorizing rulemaking and requiring reporting; providing compensation, mileage and per diem for state board members; providing appropriations and support for system development; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide education accountability-phase I.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted HB0091JC01 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - H Adopted HB0091JC01 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0116
2013-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0116
2013-02-27 Assigned Number HEA0116
2013-02-26SenateAdopted HB0091JC01
2013-02-26HouseAdopted HB0091JC01
2013-02-22SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-22HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-22HouseDid Not Concur
2013-02-21HouseReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-21SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-21 Amendment Failed
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-20SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-20 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-19SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-19 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-19 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-19SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-15SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-02-12SenateRereferred to S02
2013-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-12SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04
2013-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-02-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-06 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-06 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-04HousePassed CoW
2013-02-04 Amendment Failed
2013-02-04 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-04 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-04HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-01HouseRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-31HouseRereferred to H02
2013-01-31HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-31HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04
2013-01-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback