WY HB0084 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to employment; promoting wage equality in state employment; requiring the consideration of wage equality in state programs as specified; requiring the reporting of wage information as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wage equality-state employees and programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-18-3-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-05SenateS08 - Transportation:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24House3rd Reading:Passed 39-18-3-0-0
2019-01-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-22HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-15HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-15HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback