WY HB0079 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to interfund loans; amending provisions relating to interfund loans to the school foundation program account; clarifying provisions for interfund loans as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School finance interfund loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 43 | |
2019-02-15 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0025 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0025 |
2019-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0025 |
2019-02-13 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0025 | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-11 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0 |
2019-01-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-09 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-09 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-09 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-05 | Bill Number Assigned |