WY HB0076 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to liquor licenses; amending qualifications for applicants for resort liquor licenses; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Resort liquor licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-13 | Governor Signed HEA0029 | |
2012-03-07 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0029 | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0029 | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned Number HEA0029 | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-05 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-01 | (S06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Rereferred to S06 | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S07 | |
2012-02-29 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-21 | (H07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H07 | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |