WY HB0075 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 58 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to professions and occupations; amending and repealing audit requirements; applying uniform licensure board compensation to the Wyoming state board of funeral service practitioners; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional licensure boards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 49-2-9-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 58 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed HEA No. 0036
2016-03-02SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0036
2016-03-01HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0036
2016-03-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0036
2016-03-01HouseConcur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2016-02-29HouseReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-29Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2016-02-26Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-25SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-25SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2016-02-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2016-02-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-19House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-16HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-16 H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2016-02-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 49-2-9-0-0
2016-02-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-05 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback