WY HB0074 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Assigned Chapter Number 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to environmental quality and utilities; authorizing permits of small modular nuclear reactors; specifying permit requirements; authorizing the replacement of coal generation capacity with small modular nuclear reactor capacity; making conforming amendments; imposing a tax; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small modular nuclear reactor permitting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - Concur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13 Assigned Chapter Number 104
2020-03-13 Governor Signed HEA No. 0060
2020-03-10SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0060
2020-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0060
2020-03-10 Assigned Number HEA No. 0060
2020-03-10HouseConcur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0
2020-03-09HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-09Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2020-03-06Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-05SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-04SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2020-02-28SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2020-02-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0
2020-02-26House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-17HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 56-3-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback