WY HB0072 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to water development projects; authorizing specified Level I and Level II studies and providing appropriations; requiring reports; providing for reversion of uncontracted funds; providing funding for the University of Wyoming office of water programs; authorizing unobligated funds to be used to complete other designated project studies under certain conditions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus water bill-planning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H05 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed HEA0049
2014-03-06SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0049
2014-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0049
2014-03-05 Assigned Number HEA0049
2014-03-05SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-03-04SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-03-03SenatePassed CoW
2014-03-03 Amendment Failed
2014-02-28SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-28SenateRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05
2014-02-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-02-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-21HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-20HousePassed CoW
2014-02-20 Amendment Adopted
2014-02-20HouseAmendments Adopted
2014-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-20HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-18HouseRereferred to H02
2014-02-18HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-18HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05
2014-02-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-02-04 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback