WY HB0070 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - President Signed HEA No. 0027
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to securities; providing that a person who develops, sells or facilitates the exchange of an open blockchain token is not subject to specified securities and money transmission laws; providing specified verification authority to the secretary of state and banking commissioner; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open blockchain tokens-exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0027
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0027
2018-03-07 Assigned Number HEA No. 0027
2018-03-07HouseConcur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2018-03-07HouseReceived for Concurrence
2018-03-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2018-03-05Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2018-03-02Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2018-03-01Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-28SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-23SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-23SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2018-02-20SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-19House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2018-02-16House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-15HouseCOW:Passed
2018-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2018-02-14HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 60-0-0-0-0
2018-02-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback