WY HB0069 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to fuel tax; specifying the amounts of liquefied and nonliquefied natural gas that are equivalent to gasoline and diesel fuel for taxation purposes; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fuel tax natural gas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H03 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed HEA No. 0029
2014-03-04SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0029
2014-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0029
2014-03-03 Assigned Number HEA No. 0029
2014-03-03SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-27SenatePassed COW
2014-02-25SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-25SenateRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-21SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03
2014-02-20SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-02-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-19HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-18HousePassed COW
2014-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-17HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03
2014-02-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-02-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback